Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 117 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4609 Week
» 29443 Month
» 63775 Year
» 1729151 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1909
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 14
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
L3 366   14/08/1920
L3 5367   23/11/1929
L3 5339   25/12/1937
L3 5370   18/12/1943