Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 688 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 1704 Week
» 19756 Month
» 252676 Year
» 1918052 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #903
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 19A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
M1 A2   12/1906
M1 1153   25/07/1910
M1 1146   13/12/1912
M1 1148   23/10/1914
M1 1151   09/05/1917
M1 1148   21/11/1918
M1 1149   28/04/1921
Q4 6176   30/06/1928
Q4 5958   26/04/1930
Q4 6142   14/01/1933
Q4 5163   09/07/1938
Q4 5160   03/07/1943
Q4 6180   10/03/1945