Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 75 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4990 Week
» 16227 Month
» 249147 Year
» 1914523 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #592
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 19A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
M1 32   06/1904
M1 1153   28/06/1912
M1 1149   23/09/1914
M1 1150   28/08/1916
Q4 6052   01/11/1924
Q4 5213   05/10/1929
Q4 6174   02/09/1933