Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 664 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 1680 Week
» 19732 Month
» 252652 Year
» 1918028 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #798
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 16Sat
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B18 5196   05/12/1931
B18 5195   18/11/1933
B18 5196   26/12/1936
B18 5195   29/04/1939
B18 5196   03/05/1941
B18 5195   30/10/1943