Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 947 Today
» 919 Yesterday
» 3776 Week
» 4715 Month
» 208205 Year
» 1873581 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1405
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 4Sat
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q1 417   01/1903
Q1 421   07/12/1908
Q4 957   08/1910
Q4 5212   23/01/1915
Q1 426   06/11/1915
Q4 959   14/08/1920