Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 42 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 860 Week
» 17811 Month
» 170764 Year
» 1836140 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #468
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 6052   10/08/1929
Q4 5160   25/06/1932
Q4 5163   11/01/1936
B9 6109   17/09/1938
Q4 5962   18/09/1943