Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 739 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 7365 Week
» 32199 Month
» 66531 Year
» 1731907 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1634
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 1178   19/08/1916
Q4 159   07/02/1920
Q4 147   18/11/1922
Q4 6076   04/07/1931
Q4 6052   17/11/1934