Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 709 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 1725 Week
» 19777 Month
» 252697 Year
» 1918073 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #839
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sat
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 58   10/1903
Q4 139   03/08/1907
Q4 1142   21/10/1911
Q4 87   28/06/1913
Q4 5064   26/11/1927
Q4 5356   01/04/1933
Q4 5067   02/02/1935
Q4 6052   06/02/1937