Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 639 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 1655 Week
» 19707 Month
» 252627 Year
» 1918003 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #830
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B9 6105   27/08/1927
B5 6071   23/07/1932
B9 6111   25/08/1934
Q4 5067   16/01/1937
Q4 6052   08/07/1939
B5 6072   21/10/1944
Q4 3235   13/03/1948