Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 37 Today
» 753 Yesterday
» 2835 Week
» 14517 Month
» 167470 Year
» 1832846 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #374
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sat
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 5062   16/02/1924
Q4 6140   15/01/1927
Q4 5085   26/10/1929
Q4 5065   08/10/1932
Q4 5152   25/05/1935
Q4 5068   30/04/1938
Q4 6177   24/01/1942
Q4 5056   28/08/1943