Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 952 Today
» 1177 Yesterday
» 3258 Week
» 28092 Month
» 62424 Year
» 1727800 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #442
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sat
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 5145   05/04/1924
Q4 6075   16/02/1929
Q4 6180   02/04/1932
Q4 5135   10/11/1934
Q4 5065   14/08/1937