Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 254 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4231 Week
» 15468 Month
» 248388 Year
» 1913764 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #54
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sat
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 159   29/01/1921
Q4 5085   03/11/1928
Q4 5962   16/08/1930
Q4 5048   09/12/1933
Q4 5065   13/01/1940