Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 286 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1194 Week
» 12339 Month
» 112124 Year
» 1777500 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1691
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sat
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 71   30/06/1917
Q4 1180   29/10/1921
Q4 5048   11/10/1924
Q4 5137   21/06/1930
Q4 6140   29/04/1933