Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 920 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 5412 Week
» 30246 Month
» 64578 Year
» 1729954 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #897
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 6077   04/02/1928
Q4 6178   03/12/1932
B9 6109   09/05/1936
B9 6105   24/09/1938
Q4 5087   09/08/1941