Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 860 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 5487 Week
» 7225 Month
» 134668 Year
» 1800044 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #912
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 5044   05/01/1929
Q4 5136   16/05/1931
Q4 5151   21/04/1934
Q4 5961   08/07/1939
Q1 5048   20/03/1943