Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1438 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19241 Week
» 72257 Month
» 191784 Year
» 3218637 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #914
Pre Grouping Company |
GCR |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
17Sat |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Q4 |
6181 |
|
16/02/1929 |
Q4 |
5963 |
|
21/03/1931 |
Q4 |
5159 |
|
28/04/1934 |
Q4 |
5138 |
|
16/01/1937 |
Q4 |
6136 |
|
24/07/1943 |
|