Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 246 Today
» 1021 Yesterday
» 4592 Week
» 4592 Month
» 71454 Year
» 1736830 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1272
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sat
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 1142   03/1907
Q4 140   13/01/1912
Q4 1135   09/06/1917
Q4 1178   06/12/1919
Q4 957   11/03/1922