Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 887 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 5514 Week
» 7252 Month
» 134695 Year
» 1800071 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #431
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sat
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 6141   22/03/1924
Q4 5143   28/07/1928
Q4 6180   18/01/1930
Q4 5961   16/07/1932
Q4 6075   02/02/1935
Q4 5152   05/03/1938
Q4 6077   30/11/1940