Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 126 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4618 Week
» 29452 Month
» 63784 Year
» 1729160 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1903
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 956   31/07/1920
Q4 6134   07/07/1928
Q4 5145   29/11/1930
Q4 6141   18/08/1934
B9 6105   28/11/1936
B9 6110   29/10/1938
B9 6108   09/05/1942