Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 750 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 1766 Week
» 19818 Month
» 252738 Year
» 1918114 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #650
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 6178   12/12/1925
Q4 6133   10/05/1930
B9 6109   23/04/1932
Q4 6077   22/12/1934
B9 6114   17/07/1937
B5 5184   03/02/1940
Q4 5153   22/05/1943