Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 712 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 1728 Week
» 19780 Month
» 252700 Year
» 1918076 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #728
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 17Sup
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q4 5162   07/08/1926
B5 5180   07/02/1931
B9 6114   08/04/1933
Q4 6144   31/12/1935
Q4 5962   12/02/1938
Q4 6132   26/10/1940