Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 46 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 18957 Week
» 83911 Month
» 286575 Year
» 3313428 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #1907/27452
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
97 |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
J39 |
1451 |
|
15/10/1926 |
J39 |
1458 |
|
05/04/1933 |
J39 |
1454 |
|
01/07/1935 |
J39 |
1456 |
|
07/05/1937 |
J39 |
1473 |
|
06/09/1941 |
J39 |
1449 |
|
20/04/1944 |
J39 |
4848 |
|
01/06/1946 |
J39 |
64844 |
|
30/10/1948 |
J39 |
64853 |
|
21/08/1954 |
|