Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 512 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 1684 Week
» 20585 Month
» 20585 Year
» 1685961 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #822
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 97
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
J39 1492   02/12/1926
J39 1269   16/01/1932
J39 1496   19/09/1935
J39 2707   03/03/1938
J39 2967   30/11/1940
J39 1454   18/09/1943
J39 2740   10/07/1945
J39 64753   04/06/1948