Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 638 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 638 Week
» 19539 Month
» 19539 Year
» 1684915 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #8004
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 97
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
J39 1492   27/06/1931
J39 2781   08/02/1935
J39 1287   23/01/1937
J39 1492   27/05/1939