Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 607 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 1779 Week
» 20680 Month
» 20680 Year
» 1686056 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #8591
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 97
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
J39 2973   17/02/1932
J39 1492   23/06/1934
J39 2964   24/04/1937
J39 2717   20/07/1940
J39 2771   03/06/1944
J39 2944   01/02/1946