Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 559 Today
» 1156 Yesterday
» 5030 Week
» 16076 Month
» 16076 Year
» 1681452 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #2690
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 97
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
J39 2984   10/09/1935
J39 2996   13/09/1939
J39 1492   25/09/1943
J39 4984   11/05/1946
J39 64715   19/03/1949