Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 639 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 1811 Week
» 20712 Month
» 20712 Year
» 1686088 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #8583
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 97
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
J39 2965   13/10/1931
J39 1268   26/01/1935
J39 2973   03/04/1937
J39 2771   18/11/1939
J39 1495   27/06/1942
J39 1492   17/11/1945
J39 64974   28/08/1948
J39 64739   22/07/1950