Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 372 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 372 Week
» 26993 Month
» 26993 Year
» 1692369 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #2846/27535
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 97
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
J39 1537   16/02/1938
J39 1469   08/08/1942
J39 1470   17/03/1945
J39 4930   19/12/1947
J39 64914   15/11/1958