Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 552 Today
» 1156 Yesterday
» 5023 Week
» 16069 Month
» 16069 Year
» 1681445 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #RS125/27486
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 97
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
J39 4851   25/01/1947
J39 64920   14/05/1949
J39 64912   11/03/1955
J39 64843   06/09/1958