Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3842 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17248 Week
» 70264 Month
» 189791 Year
» 3216644 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #6680
Big Four Company |
GWR |
GWR Boiler Group |
98 |
GWR Standard Boiler |
8 |
Diagram |
HB |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4074 |
CALDICOT CASTLE |
12/12/1945 |
Castle |
4095 |
HARLECH CASTLE |
12/09/1947 |
Castle |
4075 |
CARDIFF CASTLE |
01/09/1950 |
Castle |
5046 |
EARL CAWDOR |
19/02/1953 |
Castle |
5053 |
EARL CAIRNS |
08/12/1954 |
Castle |
5013 |
ABERGAVENNY CASTLE |
01/02/1957 |
|