Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 555 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18358 Week
» 71374 Month
» 190901 Year
» 3217754 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #4639
Big Four Company |
GWR |
GWR Boiler Group |
98 |
GWR Standard Boiler |
8 |
Diagram |
HA |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5011 |
TINTAGEL CASTLE |
22/07/1927 |
Castle |
4076 |
CARMARTHEN CASTLE |
17/08/1929 |
Castle |
4075 |
CARDIFF CASTLE |
04/11/1931 |
Castle |
4032 |
QUEEN ALEXANDRA |
31/12/1934 |
Castle |
5032 |
USK CASTLE |
08/08/1938 |
Castle |
5016 |
MONTGOMERY CASTLE |
19/01/1943 |
Castle |
5081 |
LOCKHEED HUDSON |
12/11/1946 |
Castle |
5058 |
EARL OF CLANCARTY |
25/03/1949 |
Castle |
5092 |
TRESCO ABBEY |
31/08/1950 |
Castle |
5056 |
EARL OF POWIS |
01/08/1952 |
|