Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 900 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14306 Week
» 67322 Month
» 186849 Year
» 3213702 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #4608
Big Four Company |
GWR |
GWR Boiler Group |
98 |
GWR Standard Boiler |
8 |
Diagram |
HA |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4080 |
POWDERHAM CASTLE |
23/03/1924 |
Castle |
111 |
VISCOUNT CHURCHILL |
22/06/1925 |
Castle |
4095 |
HARLECH CASTLE |
17/04/1929 |
Castle |
4037 |
QUEEN PHILIPPA |
25/10/1930 |
Castle |
5007 |
ROUGEMONT CASTLE |
09/10/1936 |
Castle |
4076 |
CARMARTHEN CASTLE |
18/07/1942 |
Castle |
5060 |
EARL OF BERKELEY |
23/01/1947 |
Castle |
5082 |
SWORDFISH |
22/07/1949 |
Castle |
5053 |
EARL CAIRNS |
10/05/1951 |
Castle |
5030 |
SHIRBURN CASTLE |
01/04/1953 |
Castle |
4079 |
PENDENNIS CASTLE |
21/06/1955 |
|