Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 4954 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20566 Week
» 119211 Month
» 321875 Year
» 3348728 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #6671
Big Four Company |
GWR |
GWR Boiler Group |
98 |
GWR Standard Boiler |
8 |
Diagram |
HB |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5067 |
ST FAGANS CASTLE |
07/07/1937 |
Castle |
5065 |
NEWPORT CASTLE |
29/07/1943 |
Castle |
5026 |
CRICCIETH CASTLE |
14/12/1945 |
Castle |
4079 |
PENDENNIS CASTLE |
17/02/1949 |
Castle |
5020 |
TREMATON CASTLE |
14/12/1950 |
Castle |
4079 |
PENDENNIS CASTLE |
15/09/1952 |
Castle |
4092 |
DUNRAVEN CASTLE |
06/05/1954 |
Castle |
5053 |
EARL CAIRNS |
24/10/1956 |
|