Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 94 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17897 Week
» 70913 Month
» 190440 Year
» 3217293 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #4619
Big Four Company |
GWR |
GWR Boiler Group |
98 |
GWR Standard Boiler |
8 |
Diagram |
HA |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4089 |
DONNINGTON CASTLE |
08/07/1925 |
Castle |
4092 |
DUNRAVEN CASTLE |
16/10/1928 |
Castle |
5006 |
TREGENNA CASTLE |
05/04/1932 |
Castle |
5016 |
MONTGOMERY CASTLE |
12/04/1935 |
Castle |
5021 |
WHITTINGTON CASTLE |
08/12/1938 |
Castle |
5070 |
SIR DANIEL GOOCH |
11/12/1947 |
|