Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 29 Today
» 5422 Yesterday
» 21063 Week
» 119708 Month
» 322372 Year
» 3349225 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #D1941
Pre Grouping Company |
NER |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
50 |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
B15 |
795 |
|
18/05/1928 |
Q6 |
1249 |
|
01/08/1934 |
Q6 |
2235 |
|
13/11/1936 |
Q6 |
1252 |
|
14/04/1939 |
Q6 |
1361 |
|
03/07/1941 |
Q6 |
1280 |
|
19/05/1944 |
|