Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 3932 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17338 Week
» 70354 Month
» 189881 Year
» 3216734 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #2423
Pre Grouping Company |
NER |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
50 |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Q6 |
2266 |
|
30/03/1932 |
Q6 |
1285 |
|
20/12/1935 |
Q6 |
2263 |
|
06/07/1940 |
B15 |
823 |
|
15/04/1942 |
Q6 |
2289 |
|
23/02/1945 |
Q6 |
3456 |
|
19/06/1947 |
Q6 |
63350 |
|
29/04/1950 |
|