Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 43 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17846 Week
» 70862 Month
» 190389 Year
» 3217242 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #2441
Pre Grouping Company |
NER |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
50 |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Q6 |
2299 |
|
30/08/1932 |
Q6 |
1279 |
|
07/04/1937 |
Q6 |
2220 |
|
26/05/1939 |
Q6 |
2287 |
|
01/07/1941 |
Q6 |
1335 |
|
02/04/1943 |
Q6 |
3395 |
|
15/11/1946 |
Q6 |
63355 |
|
07/07/1949 |
|