Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 109 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17912 Week
» 70928 Month
» 190455 Year
» 3217308 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #2567
Pre Grouping Company |
NER |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
50 |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
B15 |
791 |
|
22/02/1934 |
Q6 |
2291 |
|
30/11/1937 |
Q6 |
2266 |
|
26/04/1941 |
Q6 |
2263 |
|
06/04/1944 |
Q6 |
3355 |
|
14/12/1946 |
Q6 |
3422 |
|
02/08/1949 |
|