Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 557 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 557 Week
» 27178 Month
» 27178 Year
» 1692554 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #2556
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 914   11/12/1933
Q7 901   20/08/1936
Q7 625   23/02/1939
Q7 633   22/03/1946
Q7 63471   24/12/1949