Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 317 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5036 Week
» 16181 Month
» 115966 Year
» 1781342 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #D1622
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q7 629   08/04/1924
Q7 902   30/06/1932
B16 931   08/12/1937
B16 923   22/03/1941
B16 920   21/03/1944