Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 1172 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 7855 Week
» 18901 Month
» 18901 Year
» 1684277 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #D1665
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q7 626   25/05/1927
Q7 904   20/12/1935
Q7 628   01/08/1939
B16 1375   17/09/1942
B16 1447   09/11/1946