Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 56 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2982 Week
» 4720 Month
» 132163 Year
» 1797539 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #D1614
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q7 625   18/03/1924
B16 1382   26/02/1930
B16 921   28/09/1933
B16 843   11/06/1937
B16 927   20/06/1940