Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 755 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6682 Week
» 5420 Month
» 419741 Year
» 1641306 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #24021
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q7 63469   09/06/1951
B16 61434   26/06/1954
B16 61454   05/10/1956
B16 61463   18/06/1959