Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 54 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2980 Week
» 4718 Month
» 132161 Year
» 1797537 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #2263
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q7 630   20/08/1929
B16 1377   14/11/1933
B16 943   19/10/1937
B16 2377   11/07/1941
B16 937   20/05/1944