Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 761 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6688 Week
» 5426 Month
» 419747 Year
» 1641312 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #24059
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 61453   13/06/1952
B16 61463   20/11/1954
B16 61447   21/02/1958
Q7 63470   23/02/1962