Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 607 Today
» 1156 Yesterday
» 5078 Week
» 16124 Month
» 16124 Year
» 1681500 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #D1628
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
Q7 631   03/05/1924
Q7 633   22/04/1931
B16 1374   21/09/1934
B16 925   07/07/1937
B16 2376   14/12/1940