Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 531 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3457 Week
» 5195 Month
» 132638 Year
» 1798014 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #D1465
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 2369   08/03/1923
B16 2366   13/03/1931
B16 845   21/04/1934
B16 914   05/08/1936
Q7 633   30/01/1940