Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 654 Today
» 1156 Yesterday
» 5125 Week
» 16171 Month
» 16171 Year
» 1681547 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #2879
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 2375   15/03/1937
B16 2374   02/11/1939
B16 1378   28/04/1942
Q7 634   13/04/1946
Q7 63473   10/09/1949