Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 1109 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 7792 Week
» 18838 Month
» 18838 Year
» 1684214 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #24034
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 61466   24/11/1951
B16 61447   18/09/1954
B16 61421   06/08/1958
Q7 63473   01/06/1962