Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 139 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2304 Week
» 2304 Month
» 69166 Year
» 1734542 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #2264
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 49
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B16 840   26/09/1929
B16 927   12/05/1933
B16 2373   18/03/1936
B16 845   02/12/1938
B16 924   12/02/1941